Trustees THE UK FRIENDS OF AUCKLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1111696

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Harold Coop | Chair | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marie Louise Parkin | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Khoo | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruiheng Xiao | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Fenton | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lady Rosemary Buchanan | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Collinson | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony McNaughton | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY O'CONNOR | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.