Financial history OPTIONS WIMBLEDON PREGNANCY RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity number: 1112366
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.54k £30.09k £28.45k £34.89k £30.29k
Total expenditure £42.76k £61.24k £28.45k £34.89k £30.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A