Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE MID LINCOLNSHIRE

Charity number: 1111681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £536.92k £466.68k £421.36k £465.96k £556.71k
Total expenditure £480.31k £406.43k £468.12k £470.44k £487.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £264.20k
Income from government grants £192.40k £17.66k £8.88k £196.11k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.44k N/A N/A N/A £41.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £499.39k N/A N/A N/A £513.12k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £674 N/A N/A N/A £2.60k
Income - Other £18.42k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £478.47k N/A N/A N/A £484.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.60k N/A N/A N/A £7.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £1.84k N/A N/A N/A £2.38k