Financial history MORDEN ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1112379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £460.40k £332.46k £584.74k £610.49k £628.70k
Total expenditure £465.10k £311.49k £541.92k £590.88k £567.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.53k N/A £26.20k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £540.77k £570.80k £603.29k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £43.98k £39.68k £25.41k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £530.90k £534.56k £527.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.50k £1.46k £1.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £266.67k £282.20k £206.09k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £11.02k £56.32k £40.08k