Financial history THE WATERLOO PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1111926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £35.47k £36.47k £26.61k £14.36k £19.04k
Total expenditure £29.83k £29.41k £24.26k £20.90k £24.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A