FAIRFIELD RESIDENTIAL HOME

Charity number: 1114653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of accommodation, food, care and other facilities for the elderly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John James Guy Chair 04 October 2019
THE MERRY BELLS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Dr Christopher Hornby Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Dr David Sprigings Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Rev Rachel Weir Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Mark Ryan Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Julie Brannan Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Claire Harrington Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
DAI DAVID Trustee 28 May 2021
ROTARY CLUB OF OXFORD CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Dr Charles Andrew Chivers Trustee 24 March 2017
None on record
ADRIAN O'HICKEY Trustee 02 July 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.44m £1.80m £1.80m £2.16m £2.57m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.79m £1.75m £1.94m £2.14m
Income from government contracts £149.54k £253.73k £208.99k £171.12k £168.30k
Income from government grants N/A £67.36k £78.32k £26.81k £2.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £31.46k £4.34k £7.69k £2.89k £9.18k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.73m £1.79m £2.12m £2.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.38k £3.79k £26 £1.03k £15.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.77m £1.75m £1.93m £2.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.81k £20.53k £6.37k £3.76k £4.93k
Expenditure - Governance £54.13k £31.09k £6.12k £5.32k £7.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £7.49k £0 £0 £0 £23.57k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £7.06m £7.20m £7.18m £7.18m £7.18m
Long-term investments £1 £1 £1 £1 £1
Other assets £774.72k £690.49k £749.95k £1.08m £1.48m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £180.43k £221.82k £220.82k £330.84k £294.75k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FAIRFIELD
115A BANBURY ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6LA
Phone:
01865558413
Email:
No information available