Financial history WEARDALE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1112027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £646.46k £468.82k £511.70k £537.13k £647.09k
Total expenditure £513.50k £447.74k £503.66k £579.42k £630.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.69k N/A N/A £8.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £140.99k N/A £182 £277 £516
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £479.14k N/A £490.36k £515.34k £620.40k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £781 N/A £49 £398 £973
Income - Other £25.55k N/A £21.10k £21.12k £25.19k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £513.50k N/A £503.66k £579.42k £630.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £672 £1.15k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0