Financial history PHASE WORLDWIDE (PRACTICAL HELP ACHIEVING SELF EMPOWERMENT WORLDWIDE)

Charity number: 1112734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £463.75k £525.99k £140.56k £215.19k £188.82k
Total expenditure £477.51k £386.27k £194.92k £223.46k £241.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £89.66k £133.86k £13.58k £54.09k £37.32k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £226.02k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £34.80k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £54 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £265.12k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £304.95k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £81.32k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £10.17k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £271.97k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A