Financial history NORTH EAST WAR MEMORIALS PROJECT

Charity number: 1113088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.05k £4.05k £5.68k £2.96k £1.89k
Total expenditure £19.47k £2.38k £2.08k £9.09k £3.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A