Financial history NORTH EAST HUMANISTS

Charity number: 1112965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.29k £4.88k £3.50k £3.14k £4.64k
Total expenditure £6.37k £8.86k £5.39k £3.90k £8.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A