THE HAVERS COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides building for hire for use by general public and local activity groups, ie playschools, exercise classes, dance classes, language classes, youth club, church groups, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 February 2006: Standard registration
- 11 December 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 December 2018: Funds transferred to 1173860 BISHOP'S STORTFORD COMMUNITY CENTRES CIO
No other names
- Complaints handling
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.44k | £34.04k | £33.76k | £38.16k | £35.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.41k | £29.35k | £29.51k | £29.38k | £34.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 22 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 02 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 2005,
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BISHOP'S STORTFORD AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE BISHOP'S STORTFORD AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window