KEREN ERETZ YISROEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Keren Eretz Yisroel in Israel (the Organisation) is established for the relief of poverty in Israel. This charity is also established for the relief of the poor sick and feeble in Israel, and in particular (but not exclusively) by providing financial assistance for the charitable activities of the Organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 06 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amram APPEL | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Emanuel | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.65k | £30.31k | £26.40k | £33.67k | £30.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.56k | £45.49k | £21 | £56.20k | £25.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 301 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR SICK AND FEEBLE IN ISRAEL AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE ORGANISATION 3.2 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE INCLUDING PAYMENTS BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN (WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST) TO INDIVIDUAL PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD PROVIDED THAT SUCH PERSONS QUALIFY AS OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE ORGANISATION AS DETERMINED BY ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE IN PARTICULAR ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 GOLDERS GARDENS
LONDON
NW11 9BS
- Phone:
- 02082091113
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window