Financial history PAKTRUST.ORG

Charity number: 1113301
Charity reporting is up to date (126 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.74k £35.95k £156.00k £64.66k £118.89k
Total expenditure £25.05k £19.87k £78.16k £102.48k £75.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A