SOUTH EAST WALES ORGANISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Object of the Association is to advance the education of the public in the art of music with special reference to liturgical and organ music. Membership is open to any person interested in organ, choral or other kind of music (in futherance of the Object) and who has paid the relevant annual subscription as laid down from time to time by the Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 March 2006: Standard registration
- SEWOA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Right Reverend Dr Richard David Fenwick | Chair | 21 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Aaron David Williams | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Paul Haskins | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex David Rogers | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene Mallett | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN EDWARD DAVIES BSc MBA | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROGER YEO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEOFFREY THOMAS MA BMus | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.54k | £2.39k | £1.76k | £1.66k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £1.79k | £1.19k | £1.18k | £1.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO LITURGICAL AND ORGAN MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 King Street
ABERTILLERY
Gwent
NP13 1AD
- Phone:
- 07841141499
- Email:
- yeoroger@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
sewoa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window