WIRKSWORTH AND DISTRICT MUSIC LESSONS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote musical education, musicianship and appreciation of music among children and young people who are in financial need in Derbyshire, particularly Wirksworth and area. We support, encourage, develop their musical skills particularly through support for musical instruction, for purchase or other acquisition of instruments, and through ancillary support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 April 2006: Standard registration
- THE MUSIC LESSONS FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENELM JAMES ACONS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catherine Elizabeth Rowlatt | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER CLARE ACONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LISA HANNANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH OLDAK | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROL MARY PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS C POWLSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £2.32k | £100 | £2.10k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £1.21k | £926 | £911 | £1.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 March 2021 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF MUSICAL EDUCATION, MUSICIANSHIP AND THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED IN DERBYSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR IN WIRKSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY THE SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR MUSICAL SKILLS, PARTICULARLY THROUGH SUPPORT FOR MUSICAL INSTRUCTION AND THROUGH SUPPORT FOR THE PURCHASE OR OTHER ACQUISITION OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND THROUGH OTHER ANCILLARY SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
DERBYSHIRE IN PARTICULAR WIRKSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTHOLME
CANTERBURY TERRACE
WIRKSWORTH
MATLOCK
DE4 4DY
- Phone:
- 07791411110
- Email:
- mlfund@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window