ROTHERHAM DIVERSITY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote equality and diversity by working towards the elimination of discrimination in the areas of race, gender, disability, religion and sexual orientation and to promote quality of opportunity and good relations between persons of different racial groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
Governance
- 23 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAJJAD MUNIR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD RAFIQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD AKRAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALTAF HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.18k | £2.36k | £896 | £3.22k | £4.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 May 2022 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 May 2022 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION IN THE AREAS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, RELIGION AND SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROTHERHAM DIVERSITY FORUM
GUARDIAN CENTRE
DRUMMOND STREET
ROTHERHAM
S65 1HY
- Phone:
- 01709821062
- Email:
- rotherhamltd@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
rotherhamdiversityforum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window