Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BIGGLESWADE IVEL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1113652
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £6.06k £4.89k £2.12k £2.50k £1.49k
Total expenditure £2.47k £6.07k £2.26k £1.64k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A