Financial history GOD MY SILENT PARTNER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1113218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.09m £1.25m £3.09m £1.29m £38.88k
Total expenditure £1.12m £1.24m £3.90m £1.02m £332.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £1.25m £3.09m £1.29m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £2.12k £378 £0 £12 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £30 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.23m £3.88m £1.01m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.73k £2.05k £20.37k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £64.69k £61.12k £38.77k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.17m £3.82m £973.47k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £68.47k £2.42k £4.18k £10.69k N/A