GOD MY SILENT PARTNER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
God My Silent Partner Foundation (GSMP Foundation) invests in women and girls as agents of trans-formative change in the UK and India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 March 2006: Standard registration
- GOD MY SILENT PARTNER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAMESH GOVINDJI KARSANDAS SACHDEV | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sonal Niral Patel | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|||||
PRATIBHA RAMESH GOVINDJI SACHDEV | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £1.25m | £3.09m | £1.29m | £38.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12m | £1.24m | £3.90m | £1.02m | £332.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.09m | £1.25m | £3.09m | £1.29m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.12k | £378 | £0 | £12 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £30 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £1.23m | £3.88m | £1.01m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.73k | £2.05k | £20.37k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £64.69k | £61.12k | £38.77k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.17m | £3.82m | £973.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £68.47k | £2.42k | £4.18k | £10.69k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THEM AT THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WORLDWIDE, PARTICULARLY ASIA AFRICA EUROPE AND AMERICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
REGENT HOUSE
THEOBALD STREET
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 4RS
- Phone:
- 02083271330
- Email:
- sonal@gmspfoundation.org
- Website:
-
gmspfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window