Financial history IMPACT MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1118412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/04/2020 03/04/2021 03/04/2022 03/04/2023 03/04/2024
Total gross income £1.65k £1.29k £6.54k £6.71k £9.61k
Total expenditure £2.25k £75 £1.46k £11.61k £11.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A