Financial history THE MAKERS GUILD IN WALES

Charity number: 1113675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £188.25k £268.18k £252.57k £222.84k £236.32k
Total expenditure £174.50k £186.82k £206.16k £241.13k £258.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.70k £89.48k £121.14k £86.30k £64.41k