Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF MARKET BOSWORTH TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1113665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 December 2024 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required