HUMBER ALL NATIONS ALLIANCE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote such charitable purposes for the benefit of members of the Black and Minority Ethnic Communities in the Humber region and in particular, the relief of poverty, hardship and distres; the promotion, preservation and protection of health; and the promotion of equality of opportunities and access to all facilities and services available to all citizens within the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 November 2006: Standard registration
- HANA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUSEGUN OYELEYE | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
OLANREWAJU ADEDEJI JOGUNOSINMI | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Robert James Louis Pritchard | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
ROSAMUND ALEXANDRA JUMP | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
DR PEDRAM SAEID | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Pastor Olumide Isaac Aleshinloye | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
LUANA SMITH | Trustee | 13 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.45k | £128.65k | £131.95k | £111.93k | £188.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.79k | £87.67k | £102.36k | £112.64k | £180.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC (BME) COMMUNITIES IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, KINGSTON UPON HULL, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') AND IN PARTICULAR, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITIES AND ACCESS TO ALL FACILITIES AND SERVICES AVAILABLE TO ALL CITIZENS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, KINGSTON UPON HULL, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 PORTLAND STREET
HULL
HU2 8JX
- Phone:
- 01482491177
- Email:
- admin@hanaonline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window