Financial history TORFAEN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1113724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £999.39k £1.21m £1.40m £1.56m £1.83m
Total expenditure £965.07k £1.04m £1.32m £1.47m £1.86m
Income from government contracts £348.23k £356.26k £340.21k £349.05k £363.28k
Income from government grants £80.14k £79.83k £78.44k £88.63k £95.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £101.28k £97.79k £78.93k £106.16k £95.76k
Income - Other trading activities £600 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £873.00k £1.10m £1.31m £1.42m £1.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £271 £37 £16 £631 £2.40k
Income - Other £24.23k £10.95k £11.81k £34.38k £71.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £965.07k £1.04m £1.32m £1.47m £1.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.68k £4.68k £4.68k £5.15k £5.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0