Trustees TORFAEN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1113724

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLLR JOHN KILLICK | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Griffiths | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Dorrian | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne James | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jones | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Davy | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hindley | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS HENSON | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.