Financial history SOUTH HOLLAND CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1113711
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £336.10k £340.90k £326.20k £325.94k £335.72k
Total expenditure £329.08k £322.92k £316.73k £304.94k £322.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £113.04k £235.67k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £145.95k £0