Financial history THE WORLD SPEEDWAY RIDERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.22k £25.21k £54.33k £28.12k £43.76k
Total expenditure £19.28k £22.95k £29.72k £31.21k £47.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A