Financial history BELVEDERE COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity number: 1116584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.37k £84.08k £100.14k £64.61k £78.42k
Total expenditure £86.14k £65.46k £80.79k £89.88k £121.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £66.68k N/A N/A N/A