Accounts and annual returns THE CHESHIRE GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1119592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 16 January 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required