Financial history THE CHESHIRE GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1119592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.27k £2.54k £3.25k £4.50k £5.17k
Total expenditure £5.33k £4.49k £3.70k £4.67k £5.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A