BOURNE FREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote equality and diversity for the public benefit in the UK and in particular but not exclusively the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of sexual orientation by raising awareness in issues affecting said persons in particular by promoting and staging an annual LGBT festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 07 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Tolley | Chair | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Berbers | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Dixon-Box | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Armstrong | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kris Mayo | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene Clements | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stanley | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
NEAL ERRINGTON | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE CLARKE | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.95k | £30.57k | £59.45k | £139.23k | £139.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.74k | £36.52k | £45.72k | £120.34k | £120.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AGREED 20 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2006 as amended on 14 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION BY RAISING AWARENESS IN ISSUES AFFECTING SAID PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING AND STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL.
Area of benefit
THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Barrington Centre
Pennys Walk
FERNDOWN
Dorset
BH22 9TH
- Phone:
- 07479737883
- Email:
- info@bournefree.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window