Financial history THE MASTER AND FELLOWS OF THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF SAINT CATHARINE THE VIRGIN IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.15m £18.04m £17.32m £17.71m £21.36m
Total expenditure £13.86m £12.94m £14.49m £15.73m £15.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £166.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.63m £9.23m £5.80m £4.43m £6.08m
Income - Other trading activities £1.74m £21 £283.00k £1.05m £1.66m
Income - Charitable activities £6.51m £5.91m £7.44m £7.79m £8.74m
Income - Endowments £189.00k £1.18m £823.00k £1.11m £4.48m
Income - Investment £3.07m £3.56m £3.51m £4.30m £4.62m
Income - Other £401.00k £513.00k £295.00k £146.00k £268.00k
Income - Legacies £50.00k £1.71m £4.12k £1.74m £435.21k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.19m £10.19m £11.67m £12.02m £12.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.97m £2.24m £2.27m £3.09m £2.47m
Expenditure - Governance £73.00k £89.58k £68.79k £114.00k £81.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £224.00k £84.00k £51.00k £109.00k £72.00k
Expenditure - Other £706.00k £511.00k £555.00k £630.00k £595.00k