Financial history WEST BERKSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 1115036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £270.60k £310.11k £301.49k £283.79k £295.33k
Total expenditure £247.31k £242.68k £252.54k £276.55k £259.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £115.10k N/A £105.35k £12.29k
Income from government grants £137.53k £115.10k £80.00k £20.00k £20.86k