THE LAUREL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES INCLUDE GRANT MAKING TO PROMOTE ACTION RESEARCH, INNOVATION AND EVIDENCE-BASED DEVELOPMENTS WHICH IMPROVE TEACHING, LEARNING AND LEADERSHIP BY DEVELOPING COLLABORATIVE PARTNERSHIPS OF SCHOOLS AND OTHER PROVIDERS FOR CHILDREN UP TO 11 YEARS OLD IN MULTIPLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES, INCLUDING SPECIAL SCHOOLS AND EARLY YEARS PROVIDERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 December 2006: Standard registration
- SOUTHERN EDUCATIONAL LEADERSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bill Goddard | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Sally Margaret Jarvis | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nilesh Pandya | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|||||
John Christian Kingsley Redman | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laleh Laverick | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Peter Hampson | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Stuart McPhail | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomas Thurogood-Hyde | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Tiplin | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane Bull | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Anthony Albone | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rose Grace Durban | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.44k | £65.65k | £56.35k | £53.26k | £50.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.97k | £319.91k | £212.61k | £106.04k | £387.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 June 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 APR 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 OCT 2016 as amended on 26 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY) BY PROMOTING, IMPROVING AND DEVELOPING EDUCATIONAL LEADERSHIP IN SCHOOLS, LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTING OR PROVIDING EDUCATION REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LAUREL TRUST
C/O STONE KING
BOUNDARY HOUSE
91 CHARTERHOUSE STREET
LONDON
EC1M 6HR
- Phone:
- 07960 684014
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window