Financial history HURSTPIERPOINT COTTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1116420
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £49.34k £48.82k £49.41k £54.96k £57.99k
Total expenditure £38.91k £28.18k £26.72k £29.85k £38.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A