IGNITE IMAGINATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ignite Imaginations is a community arts organisation. We ignite imaginations by increasing access to high quality creative activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,107 from 8 government contract(s) and £2,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 November 2006: Standard registration
- ART IN THE PARK (SHEFFIELD) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justin Robert Banks | Chair | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Todd | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Noble | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corrine Moss | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Michael Harvey | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Hockey | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Shields | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.66k | £235.16k | £202.06k | £173.39k | £154.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.45k | £190.96k | £235.00k | £197.77k | £210.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.49k | £7.90k | £7.05k | £3.15k | £39.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.93k | £1.75k | £500 | £2.24k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/04/2014
Charitable objects
-TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ARTS AND ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION. - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF SHEFFIELD IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ignite Imaginations
c/o SCF
Old Junior School
South View Road
Sheffield
- Phone:
- 01142686813
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window