Financial history LEATHERHEAD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1116555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £15.04k £4.53k £16.07k £24.74k £22.83k
Total expenditure £14.47k £4.43k £13.45k £25.19k £19.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A