Trustees PRO CORDA TRUST

Charity number: 1116213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Camille Daulne Trustee 21 February 2025
None on record
Peter Anthony Bradshaw Wilson Trustee 07 February 2025
None on record
Jacopo Blumberg Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Rachel Maxine Riley Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record
Keith Daley Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
James Shirras Trustee 10 June 2021
PHILHARMONIA CHORUS LIMITED
Received: On time
GRAHAM BOWLER Trustee
None on record