Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE IN WEST SUSSEX (NORTH, SOUTH, EAST)
Charity number: 1116660

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Jones | Chair | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rita Protopapa | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Anthony Aston | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Johnson | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Buckett | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Morris Bretman | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Ross | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Book | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nick Clay | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Trowbridge | Trustee | 20 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.