Financial history OVERSEAS PLASTIC SURGERY APPEAL

Charity number: 1116561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.07k £102.40k £84.17k £31.25k £76.04k
Total expenditure £52.91k £37.07k £152.09k £20.70k £42.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A