Financial history AR-RAHMAH TRUST

Charity Number: 1121296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £420.48k £503.64k £174.89k £120.34k £79.95k
Total expenditure £332.36k £300.41k £98.91k £154.16k £137.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £503.64k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £220.70k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £79.71k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.72k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £160.99k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A