Financial history THE MOORLAND MOUSIE TRUST

Charity number: 1116710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £110.27k £164.47k £318.26k £181.83k £137.61k
Total expenditure £178.15k £173.34k £173.82k £183.29k £199.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.34k N/A N/A N/A