EAST COURT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees consider all applications that fall with in its objectives contained within its trust deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 January 2007: Standard registration
- THE ANGUS AND WANDA LLOYD CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Gary Lloyd | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Pippa Satchwell-Smith | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Victoria Lloyd | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
WANDA MARIAN LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ROSS WYNDHAM BADGER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ANGUS SELWYN LLOYD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.92k | £175.26k | £173.52k | £82.25k | £245.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.90k | £73.60k | £47.34k | £71.14k | £75.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3. (A) TO PROMOTE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS UNDERTAKING CHARITABLE PURPOSES; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUAL RECIPIENTS AND/OR THEIR CHILDREN BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO HELP MEET THE EXPENSES OF THEIR EDUCATION; (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY MAKING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUAL RECIPIENTS IN STRAITENED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROUND FLOOR
45 PALL MALL
LONDON
SW1Y 5JG
- Phone:
- 02079307797
- Email:
- ross.badger@hhllp.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window