Financial history THE ERNEST FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1116823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £10.95k £50.82k £11.51k £53.06k £50.60k
Total expenditure £3.63k £46.15k £11.23k £47.49k £55.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £28.31k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.36k £3.00k N/A £19.35k