Financial history HEART OF ENGLAND COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.61m £7.18m £4.07m £3.71m £15.23m
Total expenditure £5.88m £9.20m £3.95m £3.52m £14.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.02k £646.53k £2.04m £845.04k £10.83m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.15m £7.01m £3.75m £6.05m £591.42k
Income - Other trading activities £84.38k £85.18k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £2.15k £14.27m
Income - Endowments £1.34m £244.14k £116.62k £2.92m £393.80k
Income - Investment £331.00k £308.81k £339.97k £515.17k £753.40k
Income - Other £46.58k £20.30k £96.09k £68.83k £1.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £108.98k £0 £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.78m £9.08m £3.85m £3.42m £14.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £106.24k £117.24k £40.83k £106.37k £122.29k
Expenditure - Governance £9.62k £11.04k £10.56k £12.91k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.06m £8.42m £3.26m £2.64m £13.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £55.64k £54.97k £0 £47.71k £61.84k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £59.40k £0 £0