ROTHER VOLUNTARY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RVA seeks to strengthen the social and economic wellbeing of local communities and help people fulfil their potential in a socially and environmentally sustainable fashion through its work as a development trust and council for voluntary service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £99,642 from 2 government contract(s) and £115,700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY JOHN HEMMINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon Geoffrey Hubbard | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Jayasekera | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARYL VICTORIA COOK | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Oliver Jeffs | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE NORMAN MILLS | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Linda Seddon | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £395.87k | £407.59k | £584.71k | £600.61k | £437.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £365.77k | £346.13k | £563.25k | £584.81k | £445.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £95.33k | £99.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | £133.46k | £212.06k | £317.18k | £108.00k | £115.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £317.18k | £203.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £263.95k | £395.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £46 | £1.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £3.54k | £155 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £317.18k | £203.33k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £400.03k | £584.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £163.22k | £640 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.52k | £1.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £97.53k | £120.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT F ROTHER AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT"), AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE LOCAL GOVENMENT DISTRICT OF ROTHER AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rother Voluntary Action
47 London Road
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 3JY
- Phone:
- 01424217259
- Email:
- office@rva.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window