Accounts and annual returns TRUST FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF PAKISTAN

Charity number: 1121462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 February 2025 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 February 2025 735 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required