Trustees MANCHESTER UNITED FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1118310

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Arnold | Chair | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Badyal | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Saul Becker | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
LOTTIE BIRDSALL-STRONG | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ADELE ABOEL SAAG | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MONICA SHAFAQ | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Collette Marie Roche | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
TARUN KAPUR | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|||||
DAVID MAPLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIRGINIA BUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EAMONN HOLMES OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.