BLIND CRICKET ENGLAND AND WALES (BCEW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCEW manage a number of blind/visually impaired cricket competitions annually as well as working to develop & administrate the game. Our participants include men & women of all ages & races.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Baxter | Chair | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Toplis | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lois Turner | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jelfs-White | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parsons | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Large | Trustee | 20 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Adam White | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Gavrilovic | Trustee | 08 November 2008 |
|
|||||
John Garbett | Trustee | 03 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
PETER SUGG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.63k | £48.21k | £68.25k | £62.76k | £62.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.14k | £31.06k | £59.88k | £76.85k | £79.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2016 as amended on 28 Feb 2020 as amended on 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
2. Objects The object of the Association is to promote the playing of blind cricket as an amateur sport for the benefit of individuals suffering from a serious vision impairment.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 60
Latchingdon Court
26 Forest Road
London
E17 6JT
- Phone:
- 07866751646
- Email:
- DAVIDGAVRILOVIC@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window