Financial history THE TWO ST JAMES TRUST

Charity number: 1117902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.05k £3.25k £400.71k £61.14k £53.98k
Total expenditure £6.99k £1.39k £7.28k £14.95k £41.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A